EP2567795 - Parallel link robot, parallel link robot system, and method of controlling parallel link robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-Ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakanishi, Mitsuaki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12181165.7 | 21.08.2012 | [2013/11] | Priority number, date | JP20110194351 | 06.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011194351 | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2567795 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
B25J9/1623 (EP,US);
B25J17/0266 (US);
B25J17/0283 (US);
B25J9/0051 (US);
B25J9/1674 (EP,US);
B25J17/0275 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Roboter mit parallelen Gliedern, Robotersystem mit parallelen Gliedern und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Roboters mit parallelen Gliedern | [2013/11] | English: | Parallel link robot, parallel link robot system, and method of controlling parallel link robot | [2013/11] | French: | Robot de liaison parallèle, système de robot de liaison parallèle et procédé de commande de robot de liaison parallèle | [2013/11] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2009248289 |