EP2528316 - Image processing using hybrid lookup table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chung, Woo-jun World Meridian Apt. 111-503 Uman-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Shin, Sang-youn 711-109 Sillim 13-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kim, Choon-woo Sinsigaji Apt. 802-1202 Sinwol-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Ryu, Byong-tae Chonggu Apt. 102-1302 859 Banghwa 1-dong Gangseo-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
Lee, Jong-ok Dongyang Villa Ga-102 192-63 Gajwa-dong Seo-gu Incheon / KR | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Bray, Richard Anthony Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2013/09] |
Former [2012/48] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12181593.0 | 09.10.2007 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | KR20060114119 | 17.11.2006 Original published format: KR 20060114119 | KR20070086421 | 28.08.2007 Original published format: KR 20070086421 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2528316 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2528316 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
H04N1/40075 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/126 (KR);
H04N1/40068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2012/48] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitung mit hybrider Nachschlagtabelle | [2012/48] | English: | Image processing using hybrid lookup table | [2012/48] | French: | Traitement d'images à l'aide d'une table de consultation hybride | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 09.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07118140.8 / EP1924075 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070118140) is 13.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6343159 (CUCIUREAN-ZAPAN CLARA [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 39 * * column 17, line 40 - line 55 *; | [A]US2005219620 (OHSHITA MASAKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-6* claim 1 *; | [A] - MURAT MESEMESE ET AL, "Look-Up Table (LUT) Method for Inverse Halftoning", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20011001), vol. 10, no. 10, ISSN 1057-7149, XP011025851 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - CHUNG K-L ET AL, "Inverse Halftoning Algorithm Using Edge-Based Lookup Table Approach", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20051001), vol. 14, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TIP.2005.854494, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 1583 - 1589, XP011139140 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2005.854494 | by applicant | - MURAT MESE; P. P. VAIDYANATHAN, "Look-Up Table (LUT) Method for Inverse Halftoning", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (200110), vol. 10, no. 10 |