EP2564775 - Method for controlling sensor placement time, physiological measurement apparatus, and sensor and computer program product for a physiological measurement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sivonen, Tarja Herttuantie 21 02610 Espoo / FI | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12181786.0 | 24.08.2012 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | US201113221971 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: US201113221971 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564775 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/1455 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/6843 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/447 (EP,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/0261 (EP,US);
A61B5/6825 (EP,US);
A61B5/6829 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung von Sensorpositionierungszeit, physiologische Messvorrichtung und Sensor- und Computerprogrammprodukt für eine physiologische Messvorrichtung | [2013/10] | English: | Method for controlling sensor placement time, physiological measurement apparatus, and sensor and computer program product for a physiological measurement apparatus | [2013/10] | French: | Procédé pour contrôler le temps de positionnement du capteur, appareil de mesure physiologique et capteur et produit de programme informatique pour l'appareil de mesure physiologique | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007068527 (BAKER CLARK R JR [US]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] * * figure - * [Y] 7,10; | [YA]WO2009124077 (NELLCOR PURITAN BENNETT LLC [US], et al) [Y] 7,10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 2-4 * [A] 1-6,8,9,11-14; | [A]US2007043269 (MANNHEIMER PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 7,10 * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0123] *; | [A]US4863265 (FLOWER RONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 55 - line 64 *; | [A]US2007156034 (AL-ALI AMMAR [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0074] * * figures 2-8 * |