EP2703369 - Process and plant for cement clinker production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbon-Hydrogen-Minerals SPRL Allee des Erables 11 4610 Vise (Argenteau) / BE | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyers, Christian Allée des Erables 11 4601 Visé (Argenteau) / BE | 02 /
Ericsson, Hans Linnegatan 32 11447 Stockholm / SE | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry, et al Office Hanssens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Bosch, Henry, et al Office Hanssens Colens Square Marie-Louise, 40 bte 19 1000 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 12182429.6 | 30.08.2012 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2703369 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C04B7/24, C04B7/43, C04B7/36, F27B7/20, F27B7/32 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
C04B7/24 (EP);
C04B7/367 (EP);
C04B7/434 (EP);
F27B7/2033 (EP);
F27B7/32 (EP);
Y02P40/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Zementklinkerherstellung | [2014/10] | English: | Process and plant for cement clinker production | [2014/10] | French: | Procédé et installation de production de scorie de ciment | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 14.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1947066 (KREUSCH WILHELM [BE]) [X] 4,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0014] , [0015] - [0028]; figures 1,2 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]US5555823 (DAVENPORT RICKY W [US]) [X] 4,6,7 * column 3, line 66 - column 11, line 28; figures 1-11 * * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 58 * [I] 5; | [XI]US2004157181 (ARNOLD JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] - [0031]; figures 1-3 * [I] 5-7; | [A]DE19815205 (RGG ROHSTOFF GEWINNUNGS GES MB [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 60 * * column 3, lines 6-15 *; | [XI] - A. RAUEN, "Einsatz von Giessereialtsand im Zementwerk Rohrdorf", ZEMENT KALK GIPS, (20011101), vol. 54, no. 11, pages 610 - 615, XP002689254 [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * page 610 - page 615; figures 1-5; tables 1,2 * [I] 3,5,7 | [XI] - H. Rodlmayr, "L'emploi de matières secondaires dans la Cimenterie de Rohrdorf", H. Rodlmayr, Refratechnik Cement GmbH Göttingen, REFRA-KOLLOQUIM 2004 der Firma Refratechnik in Berlin, Göttingen, Refratechnik Cement GmbH Göttingen, (20040604), pages 46 - 56, XP002689255 [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * page 46 - page 56; figures 2,3 * [I] 3,5,7 | [A] - RAUPP-PEREIRA ET AL, "New waste based clinkers: Belite and lime formulations", CEMENT AND CONCRETE RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, ELMSFORD, NY, US, (20080109), vol. 38, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.CEMCONRES.2007.11.008, ISSN 0008-8846, pages 511 - 521, XP022505274 [A] 1-8 * Chapter: "Introduction", "Experimental procedure" & "Results and discussion"; clinker CR-2;; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cemconres.2007.11.008 | [A] - KAE-LONG LIN ET AL, "Effect of Using Shell Molding Sand and Sodium Silicate Sand as Substitute Sources for Cement Raw Materials", ENVIRONMENTAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, (20110901), vol. 28, no. 9, doi:10.1089/ees.2010.0373, ISSN 1092-8758, pages 653 - 660, XP055047531 [A] 1-8 * Chapters: "Introduction", "Materials and Methods" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ees.2010.0373 | by applicant | GB1454877 |