EP2565109 - Front light of a bicycle having a catadioptric function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXA Stenman France Usine de Beaulieu 58500 Clamecy / FR | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mosset, Bernard 18 bd Victor Hugo 58000 NEVERS / FR | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2013/10] | Application number, filing date | 12182501.2 | 31.08.2012 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | FR20110057672 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: FR 1157672 | [2013/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2565109 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62J6/02, B62J6/20, B60Q1/28, B60Q1/04 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
B60Q1/04 (EP,US);
B60Q1/28 (EP);
B62J6/029 (EP,US);
B62J6/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/10] | B62J6/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorderes Beleuchtungselement eines Fahrrads, das mit einer Rückstrahlfunktion ausgestattet ist | [2013/10] | English: | Front light of a bicycle having a catadioptric function | [2013/10] | French: | Eclairage avant de bicyclette comportant une fonction catadioptrique | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 27.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 14.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0406565 (UNION SILS VAN DE LOO & CO [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 16 - line 53 *; | [A]DE29817655U (BUECHEL & CO FAHRZEUGTEILEFABR [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9113740U (FA. BUSCH & MÜLLER) [A] 1-8 * page 13, paragraph 1 - page 14, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP2020369 (BUSCH & MUELLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 30 - line 50 * * figure - *; | [A]DE9111447U (STAUDACHER, PETER) [A] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE1967707U (WIETEK & CO ELEKTROTECHN [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0406565 |