EP2706488 - Method and system for handling batch production parameter historian within ANSI/ISA/95 production scheduling extended thereof. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raviola, Alessandro Via Laviosa 37/21 16156 Genova / IT | 02 /
Reggio, Elena Salita Carupola 44 16133 Genova / IT | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/11] | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12183309.9 | 06.09.2012 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2706488 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/04 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,US);
Y02P90/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Handhabung der historischen Chargenproduktionsparameterdaten in der damit erweiterten ANSI/ISA/95 Produktionsplanung | [2014/11] | English: | Method and system for handling batch production parameter historian within ANSI/ISA/95 production scheduling extended thereof. | [2014/11] | French: | Procédé et système de manipulation d'historique de paramètres de production par lots dans une planification de production ANSI/ISA/95 étendue correspondante | [2014/11] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/11] | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2365410 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0017] *; | [AD] - Michael Bowbyes, "Empowering the enterprise level with historians", (201208), International Society of Automation, URL: http://www.isa.org/InTechTemplate.cfm?template=/ContentManagement/ContentDisplay.cfm&ContentID=90131, (20130108), XP002689776 [AD] 1-5 * the whole document * | [ID] - Bianca Scholten, "Integrating ISA-88 and ISA-95", ISA EXPO 2007, (200710), International Society of Automation, URL: http://www.isa.org/filestore/Division_TechPapers/GlassCeramics/Integrating_TP07EXPO140.pdf, (20130107), XP002689761 [ID] 1-5 * the whole document * |