EP2706117 - Process for preparing sebacic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piatesi, Andrea Im oberen Falltor 20 68239 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Baldenius, Kai-Uwe Häusserstr. 49 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Ditrich, Klaus Hermann-Sinsheimer-Weg 11 67161 Gönnheim / DE | 04 /
Kindler, Alois Rosenweg 3 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 05 /
Zajaczkowski-Fischer, Marta Otto-Dill-Strasse 5 67141 Neuhofen / DE | 06 /
Böhling, Ralf Theodor-Heuss-Str. 8 64653 Lorsch / DE | 07 /
Rehfinger, Alwin Rosenstr.10 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Dörper, Thomas Michael BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Dörper, Thomas Michael BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12183534.2 | 07.09.2012 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2706117 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64, C07C55/20, C07C59/147 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
C12Y402/01053 (EP,CN,US);
C07C55/20 (RU);
C12P7/6409 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/44 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C07C51/235 (EP,CN,US);
C07C51/373 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/235, C07C55/20 (US,CN,EP);
C07C51/373, C07C59/147 (EP,CN,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Sebacinsäure | [2014/11] | English: | Process for preparing sebacic acid | [2014/11] | French: | Procédé de préparation de l'acide sébacique | [2014/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/11] | 21.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4919085 ; | [YD]US4582804 (LITCHFIELD JOHN H [US], et al); | [A]US5952517 (RIES CHARLES DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2010203600 (DUBOIS JEAN-LUC [FR]); | by applicant | US4582804 | WO2008119735 |