EP2570047 - Show stand member to display several bottles and show stand including this show stand member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/12] | show stand member to display several bottles and show stand including this show stand member. | ||
[2014/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outillage Nourrisson Claude 4, Impasse des Avenues 42600 Montbrison / FR | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nourrisson, Vincent 5 rue de Bellevue Savigneux 42600 Savigneux / FR | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12183689.4 | 10.09.2012 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | FR20110058180 | 14.09.2011 Original published format: FR 1158180 | [2013/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2570047 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2570047 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47B13/16, A47B37/04, A47F7/28 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A47B13/16 (EP);
A47B37/04 (EP);
A47F5/04 (EP);
A47F7/28 (EP);
A47F7/283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | Ständerbauteil für mehrere Flaschen und Ständer aufweisend dieses Ständerbauteils | [2014/10] | English: | Show stand member to display several bottles and show stand including this show stand member | [2014/10] | French: | Elément de présentoir pour présenter plusieurs bouteilles et présentoir comprenant un tel élément de présentoir | [2013/12] |
Former [2013/12] | Ständerbauteil für mehrere Flaschen und Ständer aufweisend dieses Ständerbauteils. | ||
Former [2013/12] | show stand member to display several bottles and show stand including this show stand member. | Examination procedure | 16.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 05.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2012 | AL | 18.06.2014 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | RS | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | IE | 10.09.2014 | LU | 10.09.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.09.2012 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MK | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 10.09.2012 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.09.2012 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB986764 (WATERS OF COVENTRY LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10-15 * page 2, line 63 - page 2, line 65; figures 2,4,5 * * page 2, line 70 - page 2, line 73; figures 2,4,5 * * page 2, line 74 - page 2, line 80; figures 2,4,5 * * page 2, line 95 - page 2, line 98; figures 2,4,5 * * page 3, line 21 - page 3, line 27; figure 5 *; | [X]US375413 (F.F CUMMIMGS NEW YORK) [X] 1-3,7-12,14 * column 1, line 22 - column 1, line 32; figure 1 *; | [XP]US2011220599 (SIAHPUSH S ANTHONY [US]) [XP] 1-3,7-12 * figures 4,8,10 * |