EP2581114 - Respirator mask [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uvex Arbeitsschutz GmbH Würzburger Strasse 181-189 90766 Fürth / DE | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fronhöfer, Florian Blumenstr. 19 90617 Puschendorf / DE | 02 /
Horn, Lars Windhukstr. 2 22763 Hamburg / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2015/35] | 01 /
Fronhöfer, Florian Blumenstr. 19 90617 Puschendorf / DE | ||
02 /
Horn, Lars Simonstrasse 5 90763 Fürth / DE | |||
Former [2013/16] | 01 /
Fronhöfer, Florian Blumenstr. 19 90617 Puschendorf / DE | ||
02 /
Horn, Lars Simonstr. 5 90763 Fürth / DE | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12183799.1 | 11.09.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | DE20111084285 | 11.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011084285 | [2013/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2581114 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2581114 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/02, A62B18/08, A41D13/11 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
A62B18/08 (EP);
A62B18/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | A62B18/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Atemschutzmaske | [2013/16] | English: | Respirator mask | [2013/16] | French: | Masque respiratoire protecteur | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 19.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005099826 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 14 * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2008051726 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0063] * * figure 5 *; | [A]GB2079611 (MOLDEX METRIC PRODUCTS INC) [A] 1-15 * page 2, column l, line 8 - line 26 * * page 2, column r, line 108 - line 126 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2163056 (PARMELEE IND INC) [A] 1-15 * page 2, column l, line 48 - column r, line 114 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO9710027 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 21 * |