EP2537428 - Smoking article with open ended filter and restrictor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, San 1313 Goswick Ridge Road Midlothian, VA Virginia 23114 / US | 02 /
Braunshteyn, Michael S. 2018 Monument Avenue Richmond, VA Virginia 23220 / US | 03 /
Olegario, Raquel M. 8221 W. Bon View Drive Chesterfield, VA Virginia 23235 / US | 04 /
Jupe, Richard 12808 Crimson Court Richmond, VA Virginia 23233 / US | 05 /
Garthaffner, Martin 5200 Newbyswood Trail Chesterfield, VA Virginia 23832 / US | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12183846.0 | 10.03.2008 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | US20070906118P | 09.03.2007 Original published format: US 906118 P | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537428 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/04 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A24D3/043 (EP,US);
A24D3/0279 (KR);
A24D3/0283 (KR);
A24D3/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | RS | 08.10.2012 | Title | German: | Rauchartikel mit Filter mit offenem Ende und Begrenzer | [2012/52] | English: | Smoking article with open ended filter and restrictor | [2012/52] | French: | Article à fumer avec limiteur et filtre à extrémité ouverte | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 27.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/01] | 07.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08751051.7 / EP2136657 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080751051) is 16.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3581748 (CAMERON JOE) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1256154 (TOMKIN ABRAHAM EMIL [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 29; figure - *; | [A]FR2481581 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [A] 1-9 * page 5, line 5 - line 17; figure 3 *; | [XI]EP0364256 (ROTHMANS INT TOBACCO [GB]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 3, line 41 - page 5, line 20; figure - * [I] 4-6,9; | [XI]EP0482872 (ROTHMANS INT TOBACCO [GB]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 52; figure - * [I] 9; | [XP]WO2007110650 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH], et al) [XP] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2008010095 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [XP] 1* the whole document * |