EP2568427 - A computer-implemented method for displaying an individual timeline of a user of a social network, computer system and computer readable medium thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crytek GmbH Grüneburgweg 16-18 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/37] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Gface GmbH Grüneburgweg 16-18 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yerli, Cevat Sonnenmannstraße 14 60314 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Schmidt, Steffen Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12183982.3 | 12.09.2012 | [2013/11] | Priority number, date | US201161533277P | 12.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161533277 P | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2568427 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06F17/30, G06F3/048 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/0481 (EP);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Computerimplementiertes Verfahren zum Anzeigen einer individuellen Zeitlinie für einen Benutzer eines sozialen Netzwerks, Computersystem und computerlesbares Medium dafür | [2013/11] | English: | A computer-implemented method for displaying an individual timeline of a user of a social network, computer system and computer readable medium thereof | [2013/11] | French: | Procédé informatique permettant d'afficher une chronologie individuelle d'un utilisateur d'un réseau social, système informatique et support lisible par ordinateur | [2013/11] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 11.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007076150 (FACEBOOK INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US2005198031 | US2007016609 | US2007214141 | US2009171869 | US2009319914 | US2010088322 |