EP2708794 - Method and conditioning device for the discontinuous provision of liquid carbon dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | For:DE
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sporing, Marc Philipp-Reis Strasse 20 47807 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Brouns, Marcel Briandstrasse 30 47906 Kempen / DE | 03 /
Meyer, Dirk Katharina-Zimmermann-Weg 5 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Keenway Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Heine, Christian Klaus KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12184297.5 | 13.09.2012 | [2014/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708794 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F17C5/02, F17C7/02, F17C9/02 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
F17C9/00 (EP);
F17C2221/013 (EP);
F17C2223/0161 (EP);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2223/046 (EP);
F17C2225/0161 (EP);
F17C2225/035 (EP);
F17C2227/0135 (EP);
F17C2227/0323 (EP);
F17C2227/0355 (EP);
F17C2227/0388 (EP);
F17C2250/032 (EP);
F17C2250/0439 (EP);
F17C2250/0626 (EP);
F17C2250/0631 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Konditionierungsvorrichtung zum diskontinuierlichen Bereitstellen von flüssigem Kohlenstoffdioxid | [2014/12] | English: | Method and conditioning device for the discontinuous provision of liquid carbon dioxide | [2014/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de conditionnement destinés à la préparation discontinue de dioxyde de carbone liquide | [2014/12] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 01.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102005002976 (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2175187 (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0028] *; | [Y]DE102009039645 (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0035] *; | [Y]DE102006048993 (THERMO KING CORP [US]) [Y] 12,13,15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0086] *; | [A]US2008302103 (MINKKINEN ARI [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0059] *; | [A]JP2005125767 (KAWATA MFG) [A] 1-10,12,13,15 * abstract *; | [A]US2011315243 (HAYASHI RYUTARO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US5590535 (RHOADES GEORGE D [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 19 - column 8, line 64 * |