EP2572660 - Ultrasonic surgical system having a fluid cooled blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/13] | Ultrasonic surgical system having a fluid cooled blade and related cooling methods therefor | ||
[2018/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ross, Anthony B. 4541 Wellington Road Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
Stoddard, Robert B. 618 Meadowbrook Circle Steamboat Springs, CO 80487 / US | 03 /
Cunningham, James S. 1303 Alphine Avenue, 11 A Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 04 /
Dickhans, William J. 5 Dartmouth Circle Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 05 /
Hempstead, Russell D. 2717 Meadow Mountain Trail Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | 06 /
Larson, Eric R. 7355 Yucca Court Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 07 /
Kerr, Duane E. 4343 Sweetgrass Drive Loveland, CO 80537 / US | 08 /
Nau, William H. 1931 Creekside Drive Longmont, CO 80504 / US | 09 /
Ward, Arlen K. 1044 E. 132nd Way Thornton, CO 80241 / US | [2018/37] |
Former [2013/13] | 01 /
Ross, Anthony B. 4541 Wellington Road Boulder, CO Colorado 80301 / US | ||
02 /
Stoddard, Robert B. 618 Meadowbrook Circle Steamboat Springs, CO Colorado 80487 / US | |||
03 /
Cunningham, James S. 1303 Alphine Avenue, 11 A Boulder, CO Colorado 80304 / US | |||
04 /
Dickhans, William J. 5 Dartmouth Circle Longmont, CO Colorado 80503 / US | |||
05 /
Hempstead, Russell D. 2717 Meadow Mountain Trail Lafayette, CO Colorado 80026 / US | |||
06 /
Larson, Eric R. 7355 Yucca Court Boulder, CO Colorado 80301 / US | |||
07 /
Kerr, Duane E. 4343 Sweetgrass Drive Loveland, CO Colorado 80537 / US | |||
08 /
Nau, William H. 1931 Creekside Drive Longmont, CO Colorado 80504 / US | |||
09 /
Ward, Arlen K. 1044 E. 132nd Way Thornton, CO Colorado 80241 / US | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2018/37] |
Former [2013/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12184991.3 | 19.09.2012 | [2013/13] | Priority number, date | US201113236768 | 20.09.2011 Original published format: US201113236768 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2572660 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2572660 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2572660 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B17/3211, A61B17/34, A61B17/22, A61B17/00 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/3474 (EP,US);
A61B17/3211 (US);
A61B17/320068 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00106 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22021 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320084 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | A61B17/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2013/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Ultraschallsystem mit flüssigkeitsgekühlter Klinge | [2018/12] | English: | Ultrasonic surgical system having a fluid cooled blade | [2018/12] | French: | Système chirurgical à ultrasons comprenant une lame refroidie par fluide | [2018/12] |
Former [2013/13] | Chirurgisches Ultraschallsystem mit flüssigkeitsgekühlter Klinge und zugehörige Kühlverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2013/13] | Ultrasonic surgical system having a fluid cooled blade and related cooling methods therefor | ||
Former [2013/13] | Système chirurgical à ultrasons comprenant une lame refroidie par fluide et procédés de refroidissement associés | Examination procedure | 22.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 24.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2012 | AL | 12.09.2018 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | IT | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | RS | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | SM | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | LU | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 19.09.2012 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005209578 (CHRISTIAN EVANS EDWARD A [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0107] *; | [XI]US2009036914 (HOUSER KEVIN L [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0079] * [I] 5,9 |