EP2605028 - Device for monitoring battery cell voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna E-Car Systems GmbH & Co OG Liebenauer Hauptstrasse 317 8041 Graz / AT | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geidl, Uwe Schwarzer Weg 10 8101 Gratkorn / AT | 02 /
Stark, Johann Schemerlhöhe 426 8302 Nestelbach/Graz / AT | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele Magna International Europe AG Patentabteilung Liebenauer Hauptstrasse 317 VG-Nord 8041 Graz / AT | [2013/25] | Application number, filing date | 12185017.6 | 19.09.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | EP20110193187 | 13.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11193187 | [2013/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2605028 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36, H01M10/48 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
H01M8/0618 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
G01R31/364 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M50/569 (EP,US);
H01M8/1233 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Spannungsüberwachung von Batteriezellen | [2013/25] | English: | Device for monitoring battery cell voltage | [2013/25] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance de la tension de cellules de batterie | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19810746 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure 3 *; | [I]AT9790U (MAGNA STEYR FAHRZEUGTECHNIK AG [AT]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008220324 (PHILLIPS STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0093] - [0095]; figures 11-12 *; | [A]WO2010031856 (MAGNA STEYR FAHRZEUGTECHNIK AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 10; figures 1-12 *; | [A]DE102009036086 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2315292 (IPS INTEGRATED POWER SOLUTIONS AG [CH]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0071] - [0072]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP2337115 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1-8* claim 1 *; | [A]DE102010022689 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0037] - [0039]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE19847190 | US2011045329 | DE102009050315 |