EP2600337 - Inline image rotation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states APPLE INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tripathi, Brijesh c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Bhargava, Nitin c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
Okruhlica, Craig M. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12185179.4 | 20.09.2012 | [2013/23] | Priority number, date | US201113306429 | 29.11.2011 Original published format: US201113306429 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2600337 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2600337 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/36, G06T1/60, G09G5/393, G06T3/60 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
G06T3/606 (EP,US);
G06T3/00 (KR);
G09G5/373 (KR);
G09G5/393 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0492 (EP,US);
G09G2360/122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | G09G5/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Inline-Bilddrehung | [2013/23] | English: | Inline image rotation | [2013/23] | French: | Rotation d'image en ligne | [2013/23] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 03.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6104843 (NAKASHIMA TADASHI [JP]) [Y] 5* column 23, line 65 - column 24, line 3; figures 6,8 *; | [XYI]US2007195113 (WALTON DEREK T [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * [Y] 5 [I] 6-15 |