EP2712211 - Hearing aid for providing phone signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN ReSound A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pedersen, Brian Dam Baretten 79 DK-4100 Ringsted / DK | 02 /
Hansen, Kim Heegaard Byagerparken 81F DK-4030 Tune / DK | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2015/38] |
Former [2014/13] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 12185952.4 | 25.09.2012 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712211 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2712211 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
H04R25/558 (EP);
H04R2225/53 (EP);
H04R2430/01 (EP);
H04R25/552 (EP);
H04R25/554 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2014/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Hörgerät zum Wiedergeben von Telefonsignalen | [2015/15] | English: | Hearing aid for providing phone signals | [2014/13] | French: | Prothèse auditive pour reproduire des signaux téléphoniques | [2015/15] |
Former [2014/13] | Hörgerät zur Behandlung von Telefonsignalen | ||
Former [2014/13] | Prothèse auditive pour traiter des signaux téléphoniques | Examination procedure | 26.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 08.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2012 | AL | 16.09.2015 | AT | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | MT | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | RS | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | IE | 25.09.2015 | LU | 25.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009154742 (RASMUSSEN KARSTEN BO [DK]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0027] - [0033] - [0079] , [0087] - [0127]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1251714 (GENNUM CORP [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |