EP2575000 - Obstacle sensor and robot cleaner having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Yeon Kyu C-705,Bangjuk-Haeorum-vill Sin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Shin 241-2004, Sibeom-Hanbitmaeul-Geumho Apt Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jeong Hun 205-1103, Doosan-weve Apt. Banweol-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Jong Owan 613-1203, Narumaeul-sindo-branew Apt. Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Yoon, Sang Sik 1-1508, Twinpark Ingye-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Lee, Dong Hun 110-1005,Sinan-1st Apt. Bono-2-dong Sangrok-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
So, Jea Yun 102, FIFA-Korea Sin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12185970.6 | 25.09.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | KR20110098191 | 28.09.2011 Original published format: KR 20110098191 | KR20120050312 | 11.05.2012 Original published format: KR 20120050312 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2575000 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2575000 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G01S17/88, G01S17/93, G01S7/481, G02B17/08 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
G01S17/88 (EP,US);
G01S17/00 (US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/4813 (EP,US);
G01S7/4814 (EP,US);
G01S7/4816 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/14] | G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2013/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hindernissensor und Roboterreiniger mit solch einem Sensor | [2013/14] | English: | Obstacle sensor and robot cleaner having the same | [2013/14] | French: | Détecteur d'obstacle et robot de nettoyage en disposant | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 12.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101619962 (UNIV ZHEJIANG TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y] - Rad Orghidan, "Catadioptric stereo based on structured light projection", PhD thesis in Computer Engineering, (20051230), pages i - 168, URL: http://eia.udg.es/~qsalvi/tesi_raduorghidan.pdf, (20170117), XP055336133 [Y] 1,9-12,15 * page 38 - page 29 * * page 50 - page 55; figures 3.1,3.2,3.3,3.4, 3.12 * * pages 82,94; figures 3.19, 3.20, 4.5 * * page 112 - page 113; figures 5.2,5.3 * | [Y] - SPACEK ET AL, "A catadioptric sensor with multiple viewpoints", ROBOTICS AND AUTONOMOUS SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 51, no. 1, ISSN 0921-8890, (20050430), pages 3 - 15, (20050430), XP027792904 [Y] 1,9-12,15 * abstract * * page 4, column R - page 10 * |