EP2575030 - Printing control apparatus, certification server, image processing system, printing control method, and printing control program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Toshimitsu c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12186069.6 | 26.09.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | JP20110212188 | 28.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011212188 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2575030 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2575030 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H04N1/32144 (EP,US);
G06F3/1219 (EP,US);
G06F3/1253 (EP,US);
G06F3/1288 (EP,US);
G06K15/02 (US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drucksteuerungsvorrichtung, Zertifizierungsserver, Bildverarbeitungssystem, Drucksteuerungsverfahren und Drucksteuerungsprogramm | [2013/14] | English: | Printing control apparatus, certification server, image processing system, printing control method, and printing control program | [2013/14] | French: | Appareil de commande d'impression, serveur de certification, système de traitement d'image, procédé de commande d'impression et programme de commande d'impression | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]JP2007283719 (RISO KAGAKU CORP) [ID] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1524839 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 1-12b * | by applicant | JP2007283719 |