EP2574287 - Devices for closing the left atrial appendage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sentreheart, Inc. 300 Saginaw Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2015/34] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Sentreheart, Inc. 2468 Embarcadero Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Gary H. 529 Bryce Court Milpitas, California 95035 / US | 02 /
Seiber, Russell A. 108 Monaco Drive Redwood Shores, California 94065 / US | 03 /
Fung, Gregory W. 301 San Miguel Avenue San Mateo, California 94403 / US | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/14] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 12186090.2 | 25.03.2008 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | US20070921002P | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 921002 P | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574287 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2574287 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/12013 (EP,US);
A61B17/0467 (US);
A61B17/0469 (US);
A61M25/10 (US);
A61B17/12009 (US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00575 (US);
A61B2017/00623 (US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0475 (US);
A61B2017/0477 (US);
A61B2090/3966 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2013/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen zum Schließen des linken Herzohrs | [2013/14] | English: | Devices for closing the left atrial appendage | [2013/14] | French: | Dispositifs pour la fermeture de l'appendice auriculaire gauche | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 04.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08727155.7 / EP2142107 | Divisional application(s) | EP15153029.2 / EP2929842 | EP19179162.3 / EP3603539 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080727155) is 16.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2008 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | HR | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | NO | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.03.2008 | |
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.03.2008 | |
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | EE | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | EE | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | EE | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 22.04.2015 | |
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 22.04.2015 | |
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5281238 (CHIN ALBERT K [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, lines 30-48 * * column 5, lines 59-61 * * column 6, lines 2-10 * * figures 7,9 *; | [Y]US5908429 (YOON INBAE [US]) [Y] 5* column 9, lines 63-65 *; | [Y]EP1010397 (AMI GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-11 * figures 1,5 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0017] , [0027] , [0030] , [0031] *; | [Y]EP1685802 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * |