EP2712835 - Handle for lifting hook [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baecke, Remie Koninginnestraat 8 4568 PT Nieuw-Namen / NL | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Duyver, Jurgen Martha Herman, et al Gevers Patents Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2014/14] | Application number, filing date | 12186325.2 | 27.09.2012 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712835 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/22 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
B66C1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Griff für einen Hebehaken | [2014/14] | English: | Handle for lifting hook | [2014/14] | French: | Poignée pour crochet de levage | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004217610 (HOLLMAN BERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5727834 (WESELOWSKI JAMES [CA]) [AD] 1,2,8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5727834 | US3782772 |