EP2713444 - Battery clamp with vertical screw connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercable GmbH Leverkuser Strasse 65 42863 Remscheid / DE | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgartner, Christoph H. Delagostr. 6/a 39031 Bruneck / IT | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12186512.5 | 28.09.2012 | [2014/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713444 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R11/28 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
H01R11/283 (EP);
H01R11/286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Batterieklemme mit Vertikalverschraubung | [2014/14] | English: | Battery clamp with vertical screw connection | [2014/14] | French: | Borne de batterie avec vissage vertical | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/16] | 13.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1064611 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [X] 1-3,5-12 * figures 1-8 * [I] 4; | [XI]DE4138547 (MERCEDES-BENZ AG) [X] 1-3,5-12 * figures 1-5 * [I] 4; | [XI]US5302143 (INOUE NORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12 * figures 1-15 * [I] 4; | [XI]JP2003187783 (YAZAKI CORP) [X] 1-3,5-12 * figures 1-9 * [I] 4; | [A]DE4226563 (HAUSEN AUTO KABEL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 4 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0451488 |