EP2575012 - Predictive touch surface scanning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parade Technologies, Ltd. P.O. Box 309GT Ugland House South Church St. George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | [2015/51] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 198 Champion Court San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, David G 16069 Cayenne Creek Road San Diego, California 92127 / US | 02 /
Kolokowsky, Steven 7915 Rufus Ct. San Diego, California 92129 / US | 03 /
Grivna, Edward L 8913 Montegue Terrace Brooklyn Park, Minnesota 55443 / US | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Cooper, John Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12186513.3 | 28.09.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | US201113250379 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: US201113250379 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2575012 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2575012 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/041661 (EP,US);
G06F3/04166 (KR);
G06F1/3262 (KR);
G06F3/041662 (EP,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04104 (KR);
G06F2203/04808 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Prädiktive Berührungsflächenabtastung | [2013/14] | English: | Predictive touch surface scanning | [2013/14] | French: | Balayage de surface tactile prédictive | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 10.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007229468 (PENG TAO [CN], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] , [0115] - [0122] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0120] *[I] 1-12,14,15; | [XI]US2011025629 (GRIVNA EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * [I] 2-12,15 |