EP2657973 - Display device, array substrate, thin film transistor and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2016/45] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Boe Technology Group Co. Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yuan, Guangcai No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA 100176 Beijing / CN | 02 /
Lee, Woobong No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA 100176 Beijing / CN | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/44] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12186634.7 | 28.09.2012 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | CN201210134094 | 28.04.2012 Original published format: CN201210134094 | CN201210141511 | 08.05.2012 Original published format: CN201210141511 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2657973 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2657973 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/49, H01L29/786, H01L29/66 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H01L29/40114 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/4908 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/42384 (US);
H01L29/51 (KR);
H01L29/66742 (KR);
H01L29/66969 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung, Arraysubstrat, Dünnfilmtransistor und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2013/44] | English: | Display device, array substrate, thin film transistor and method for manufacturing the same | [2013/44] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage, substrat de réseau, transistor à film mince et son procédé de fabrication | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.05.2016 | 03.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2012 | AL | 09.11.2016 | AT | 09.11.2016 | BE | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | IT | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | RS | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
TR | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010065841 (LEE JE-HUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-13,18,19,21,22,25,26 * paragraphs [0043] , [0046] , [0074] , [0079] , [0091] - [0094]; figures 8,9 *; | [XI]US2011003430 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,11,14-17,19,20,23 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0091] - [0093] - [0166]; figure 1A * [I] 24; | [X]US2011127518 (JUNG JI-SIM [KR], et al) [X] 1,14-16,19,20 * paragraphs [0034] , [0037] , [0072]; figure 1 * | Examination | US2010283049 | US2003047785 | US2011117697 | US2011140116 |