EP2565894 - Magnetic flux measuring appartus of stationary induction electric device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/10] | Magnetic flux measuring appartus of stationary induction electric device, magnetic flux measuring method thereof, and synchronous switch control apparatus of crossing gate | ||
[2013/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Minoru KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, C/O Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12187421.8 | 12.10.2007 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | JP20060281493 | 16.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006281493 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2565894 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2565894 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/54, G01R33/02, G01R33/00, G01R33/028 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
G01R33/04 (EP,US);
G01R33/0029 (EP,US);
G01R33/02 (EP,US);
G01R33/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | Messvorrichtung für den magnetischen Fluss einer stationären elektrischen Induktionseinrichtung | [2013/48] | English: | Magnetic flux measuring appartus of stationary induction electric device | [2013/48] | French: | Appareil de mesure de flux magnétique d'un dispositif électrique à induction stationnaire | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/10] | Messvorrichtung für den magnetischen Fluss einer stationären elektrischen Induktionseinrichtung, Verfahren zur Messung des magnetischen Flusses dafür und Synchron-Schaltsteuervorrichtung der Schranke | ||
Former [2013/10] | Magnetic flux measuring appartus of stationary induction electric device, magnetic flux measuring method thereof, and synchronous switch control apparatus of crossing gate | ||
Former [2013/10] | Appareil de mesure de flux magnétique d'un dispositif électrique à induction stationnaire, son procédé de mesure de flux magnétique et appareil de commande de commutation synchrone pour rupture | Examination procedure | 05.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 06.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07827890.0 / EP2075814 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070827890) is 30.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2007 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | GB | 12.10.2014 | IE | 12.10.2014 | LU | 12.10.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.10.2007 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 12.10.2014 | ||
IE | 12.10.2014 | ||
LU | 12.10.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 12.10.2014 | ||
IE | 12.10.2014 | ||
LU | 12.10.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 12.10.2014 | ||
IE | 12.10.2014 | ||
LU | 12.10.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 12.10.2014 | ||
IE | 12.10.2014 | ||
LU | 12.10.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 12.10.2014 | ||
LU | 12.10.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 12.10.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 12.10.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 12.10.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6043647 (SHIH KELVIN [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract, Fig. 3, column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 14 *; | [A]US6124713 (BORNHOFFT WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract, Fig. 3, column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 55. *; | [AD]JP2005204368 (TM T & D KK) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0018] * | by applicant | JP2000275311 | JP2003232840 | JP2005204368 | - "Controlled Switching of Unloaded Power Transformers", ELECTRA NO. 212, (2004), no. 38 |