EP2578127 - Robot cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Seung Il Ga-110, Jinyang Apt., Sosabon-bon-dong, Sosa-gu Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Dong Won 104-2304, Daewoo-Prugio, Seokwoo-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Yoon, Sang Sik 1-1508, Twinpark, Ingye-dong, Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jun Hwa 706-1504, Salgugol-7th Apt., Yeongtong-2-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Jang, Hwi Chan 505-1601, Woonam Apt., Sinbong-dong, Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12187470.5 | 05.10.2012 | [2013/15] | Priority number, date | KR20110101852 | 06.10.2011 Original published format: KR 20110101852 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2578127 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2578127 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/00, A47L11/40 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
A47L11/24 (EP,US);
A47L9/00 (EP,KR,US);
A47L5/12 (CN);
A47L11/20 (KR);
A47L11/40 (EP,US);
A47L11/4036 (US);
A47L11/4038 (EP,US);
A47L11/4055 (EP,US);
A47L11/4058 (EP,US);
A47L11/4061 (EP,US);
A47L11/4069 (EP,US);
A47L9/04 (CN,KR);
A47L9/0411 (CN);
A47L9/0461 (CN);
A47L9/28 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | Reinigungsroboter | [2013/15] | English: | Robot cleaner | [2013/15] | French: | Robot nettoyeur | [2013/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 20.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2012 | AL | 16.07.2014 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | ES | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | HR | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | MK | 16.07.2014 | MT | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | RS | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | SM | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | IE | 05.10.2014 | LU | 05.10.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | NO | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MK | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 05.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006021168 (NISHIKAWA MASATO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figures 6-11 *; | [A]US2004187249 (JONES JOSEPH L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0491]; figure 2a *; | [A]US2010037418 (HUSSEY PATRICK ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 7a-7d *; | [A]EP2371255 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2008276407 (SCHNITTMAN MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0070]; figures 8,91-5 * |