EP2586743 - Low-temperature hydrogen production from oxygenated hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | 22.09.2017 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION 614 Walnut Street Madison, WI 53707-7365 / US | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cortright, Randy, D 202 North Allen Street Madison, WI Wisconsin 53705 / US | 02 /
Dumesic, James A 3402 Sugar Maple Lane Verona, WI Wisconsin 53593 / US | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Georgiou, Sarah Caroline Williams Powell 5 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Georgiou, Sarah Caroline Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 12187533.0 | 27.11.2002 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | US20010998552 | 29.11.2001 Original published format: US 998552 | US20020306258 | 27.11.2002 Original published format: US 306258 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586743 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/32, C01B3/22, C01B3/50 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
C01B3/326 (EP,US);
C01B3/22 (EP,US);
C01B3/501 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0277 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0283 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0405 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0495 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1064 (EP,US);
C01B2203/107 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2013/18] | Title | German: | Tieftemperatur-Wasserstoffherstellung aus sauerstoffgesättigten Kohlenwasserstoffen | [2013/18] | English: | Low-temperature hydrogen production from oxygenated hydrocarbons | [2013/18] | French: | Production d'hydrogène à basse température à partir d'hydrocarbures oxygénés | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 24.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/43] | 20.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.02.2018 | 02.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02804080.6 / EP1458645 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020804080) is 07.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1063011 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0051] * * figure 1 *; | [XI]US5651953 (YOKOYAMA SHINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-11,13-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 11 * [I] 5,12; | [X]US5019135 (SEALOCK JR L JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,11-15 * column 9, line 18 - line 26 * * column 10, line 18 - line 57 * * table 5 * * claims 1,5,6 *; | [T] - CORTRIGHT R D ET AL, "Hydrogen from catalytic reforming of biomass-derived hydrocarbons in liquid water", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, (20020829), vol. 418, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 964 - 967, XP002388667 [T] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature01009 | by applicant | US6221117 | - B. LINDSTROM; L. J. PETTERSSON, INT. J. HYDROGEN ENERGY, (2001), vol. 26, no. 9, page 923 | - J. ROSTRUP-NIELSEN, PHYS. CHEM. CHEM. PHYS., (2001), vol. 3, page 283 | - WANG ET AL., APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, (1996), vol. 143, pages 245 - 270 |