EP2581866 - Computing system method for advertising a future ad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crytek IP Holding LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington DE 19808 / US | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Crytek GmbH Grüneburgweg 16-18 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Gface GmbH Grüneburgweg 16-18 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yerli, Cevat Sonnenmannstraße 14 60314 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Schmidt, Steffen Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12187957.1 | 10.10.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | US201161546976P | 13.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161546976 P | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581866 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q30/02 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0264 (EP,US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Berechnungssystem zum Werben für eine zukünftige Anzeige | [2013/16] | English: | Computing system method for advertising a future ad | [2013/16] | French: | Procédé de système informatique pour une publicité future | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2018 | 20.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/06] | 24.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6369840 (BARNETT THEODORE H [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,4,7,8 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 60 *; | [I]US2008052162 (WOOD CHARLES B [US]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] *; | [I]US2008294994 (KRUGER JUSTIN DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * | by applicant | US2005197894 | US2008046311 |