EP2720238 - Dye-sensitized solar cells, metal complex dyes therefor, and methods for making such dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay SA Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Max Josef 8 Varloh 30900 WEDEMARK / DE | 02 /
Jung, Il Avenue d'Epenex 13 1024 ECUBLENS / CH | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Mross, Stefan P.M., et al SOLVAY S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Mross, Stefan P.M., et al SOLVAY S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 12188026.4 | 10.10.2012 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2720238 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20, // C07F15/00 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
C07F15/0053 (EP);
C07D409/14 (EP);
C09B57/10 (EP);
H01G9/2018 (EP);
H01G9/2068 (EP);
H10K85/344 (EP);
H01G9/2031 (EP);
H01G9/2059 (EP);
Y02E10/542 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Farbstoffsensibilisierte Solarzellen, Metallkomplexfarbstoff dafür und Verfahren zum Herstellen solcher Farbstoffe | [2014/16] | English: | Dye-sensitized solar cells, metal complex dyes therefor, and methods for making such dyes | [2014/16] | French: | Cellules solaires sensibilisées aux colorants, colorants complexes métalliques associés et procédés de fabrication de tels colorants | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 24.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03038508 (UNIV COLORADO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6* examples 6,7 *; | [I]WO2008054024 (NIPPON OIL CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1 * page 57 - page 58; compound 3 *; | [A]US2012073660 (CHI YUN [TW], et al) [A] 1,5,11 * claims 7-14; compounds TF-4 *; | [X] - B. E. HARDIN, H. J. SNAITH, M. D. MCGEHEE, "The renaissance of dye-sensitized solar cells", NATURE PHOTONICS, (201203), vol. 6, pages 162 - 169, XP002693640 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nphoton.2012.22 | [A] - NUSBAUMER H ET AL, "COII(DBBIP)22+ COMPLEX RIVALS TRI-IODIDE/IODIDE REDOX MEDIATOR IN DYE-SENSITIZED PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY. B, MATERIALS, SURFACES, INTERFACES AND BIOPHYSICAL, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20011101), vol. 105, no. 43, doi:10.1021/JP012075A, ISSN 1089-5647, pages 10461 - 10464, XP008043902 [A] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp012075a | by applicant | US7019138 |