EP2584481 - A method and a touch-sensitive device for performing a search [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Sehwan Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Gover, Richard Paul, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/17] | Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12188801.0 | 17.10.2012 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | KR20110105795 | 17.10.2011 Original published format: KR 20110105795 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2584481 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2584481 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0488 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
G06F16/14 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/2428 (EP,US);
G06F3/0237 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0238 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und berührungsempfindliche Vorrichtung zur Durchführung einer Suche | [2013/17] | English: | A method and a touch-sensitive device for performing a search | [2013/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif tactile pour effectuer une recherche | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 30.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/35] | 10.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP18176320.2 / EP3388961 | EP21192860.1 / EP3933555 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010040208 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) |