EP2722241 - Brake system for a vehicle and method of operating a brake system of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cagnac, Bastien 4 Place Jules Uhry 60660 Cramoisy / FR | [2014/17] | Application number, filing date | 12188995.0 | 18.10.2012 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2722241 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/18, // B60T11/20 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
B60T11/20 (EP);
B60T17/18 (EP);
B60T7/042 (EP);
B60T8/344 (EP);
B60T8/88 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bremssystem für ein Fahrzeug und Verfahren für den Betrieb des Bremssystems eines Fahrzeugs | [2014/17] | English: | Brake system for a vehicle and method of operating a brake system of a vehicle | [2014/17] | French: | Système de freinage pour véhicule et procédé de fonctionnement d'un système de freinage de véhicule | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH318682 (BEKA ST AUBIN AG [CH]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2849948 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1-4 * page 8, paragraph l; figure 2 *; | [X]US2984071 (OLSON CARL T, et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE202004006454U (SPIEGLER LOTHAR [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US3245726 (WILLIAM STELZER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19825278 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 2; figure 2 *; | [A]JP2008230362 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19601110 |