EP2587655 - Driving circuit for lamps controlled via bluetooth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lextar Electronics Corp. No. 3, Gongye E. 3rd Rd. Hsinchu Science Park 30075 Hsinchu / TW | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Chun-Kuang 2F., No.25, Ln. 458 Shezhong St. Shilin Dist. 111 Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Chen, Po-Shen 3F., No.54, Ln. 382 Sec. 4, Sanhe Rd. Sanchong Dist. 241 New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Lin, Feng-Ling No. 436, Gusong W. Ln. ChongLan Vil. Pingtung City / TW | 04 /
Chen, Hui-Ying No.7, Aly. 70, Ln. 382, Sec. 1 Hecuo Rd. Yuemei Vil. Hemei Township 508 Changhua County / TW | 05 /
Chen, Tung-Yu No.17, Aly. 46, Ln. 478, Sec. 1 Anhe Rd. Annan Dist. 709 Tainan City / TW | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
Chen, Chun-Kuang 2F., No.25, Ln. 458 Shezhong St. Shilin Dist. 111 Taipei City / TW | ||
02 /
Lin, Feng-Ling No.436, Gusong W. Ln. ChongLan Vil. Pingtung City / TW | |||
03 /
Chen, Po-Shen 3F., No.54, Ln. 382 Sec. 4, Sanhe Rd. Sanchong Dist 241 New Taipei City / TW | |||
04 /
Chen, Hui-Ying No.7, Aly. 70, Ln. 382, Sec. 1 Hecuo Rd. Yuemei Vil. Hemei Township 508 Changhua County / TW | |||
05 /
Chen, Tung-Yu No.17, Aly. 46, Ln. 478, Sec. 1 Anhe Rd. Annan Dist. 709 Tainan City / TW | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12189043.8 | 18.10.2012 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | TW20110137646 | 18.10.2011 Original published format: TW 100137646 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2587655 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2587655 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/08, H02M1/32, H02M7/06, H05B33/08, H02M1/00 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H02M7/064 (EP,US);
H05B47/00 (EP);
H02M1/008 (EP,US);
H02M7/05 (EP);
Y02B20/30 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | H02M7/08, H02M1/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Treiberschaltung für mittels Bluetooth angesteuerte Lampen | [2013/18] | English: | Driving circuit for lamps controlled via bluetooth | [2013/18] | French: | Circuit de commande pour lampes contrôlées via Bluetooth | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US7602158 (IACOB ALIN THEODOR [US]) [X] 1,8 * figure 6 * * column 1, lines 13-20 * * column 6, lines 48-66 * * column 7, lines 4-9,10-16,29-34 * [Y] 3-7,9-15 [I] 2; | [Y]US3588864 (GAULKE WALLACE E) [Y] 3-7,11-14 * figure 3 * * column 5, lines 64-72 *; | [Y]US2011130888 (GERSTENKORN BERNHARD [CH]) [Y] 9-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0037] , [0040] , [0046] , [0048] , [0049] , [0050] , [0062] , [0065] * |