EP2583773 - Additive manufacturing process comprising relieving stresses of the manufactured workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2017/29] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Aerojet Rocketdyne of DE, Inc. P.O. Box 7922 RLB-70 Canoga Park, CA 91309 / US | ||
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Pratt & Whitney Rocketdyne Inc. 6633 Canoga Avenue Canoga Park, CA 91309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keremes, John J. 6633 Canoga Avenue Canoga Park, CA California 91309 / US | 02 /
Haynes, Jeffrey D. 6633 Canoga Avenue Canoga Park, CA California 91309 / US | 03 /
Gao, Youping 6633 Canoga Avenue Canoga Park, CA California 91309 / US | 04 /
Matejczyk, Daniel Edward 6633 Canoga Avenue Canoga Park, CA California 91309 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/17] | Application number, filing date | 12189076.8 | 18.10.2012 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | US201161549883P | 21.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161549883 P | US201213362425 | 31.01.2012 Original published format: US201213362425 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2583773 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2583773 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B29C67/00, B29C71/02, B29C35/02, B29C35/08, B29C35/16 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
B29C71/02 (EP,US);
B22F10/32 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B29C64/295 (EP,US);
B29C64/371 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/64 (EP,US);
B22F12/60 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0211 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0811 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0838 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | B22F3/105, B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Additives Fertigungsverfahren umfassend die Entlastung der Spannungen des gefertigten Werkstückes | [2013/17] | English: | Additive manufacturing process comprising relieving stresses of the manufactured workpiece | [2013/17] | French: | Procédé de fabrication par ajout de matière comportant le relâchement des contraintes de la pièce fabriquée | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 14.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6925346 (MAZUMDER JYOTI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,13 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 39 * * column 7, lines 30-38 * [Y] 8,11,14,15 [I] 6,7,12; | [Y]US2009020901 (SCHILLEN VOLKER [DE], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0076] ** figure 5A *; | [X]US2011008530 (WOODS BRYAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 30] - [0035] * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2011042031 (FURLONG MICHAEL THOMAS [GB], et al) [Y] 8,11,14 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 64] , [0 85] * * figure 1 * |