EP2564872 - Mazindol alone or in combination with iron for the treatment of attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/10] | Combination of mazindol in the treatment of attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder | ||
[2020/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NLS Pharmaceutics AG Alter Postplatz 2 6370 Stans / CH | [2020/41] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states NLS-1 Pharma AG Alter Postplatz 2 6370 Stans / CH | ||
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states ASSISTANCE PUBLIQUE, HOPITAUX DE PARIS 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konofal, Eric Château de Beauval, 2 Avenue de Compiègne 60300 Senlis / FR | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2013/10] | Application number, filing date | 12189703.7 | 11.04.2007 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | FR20060003197 | 11.04.2006 Original published format: FR 0603197 | [2013/10] | Previously filed application, date | EP20070727980 | 11.04.2007 | [2013/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564872 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2564872 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4188, A61K33/26, A61P25/26 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/4188 (EP,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K33/26 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4188, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/41, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/26, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/10] | A61K45/06, A61K31/4188, A61K33/26, A61P25/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2013/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mazindol als Einzelwirkstoff oder in Kombination mit Eisen zur Behandlung der Aufmerksamkeitsdefizit-Hyperaktivitätsstörung | [2020/04] | English: | Mazindol alone or in combination with iron for the treatment of attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder | [2020/04] | French: | Mazindol en tant que seul principe actif ou en combinaison avec du fer pour le traitement du déficit de l'attention/hyperactivité | [2020/04] |
Former [2013/10] | Assoziation von Mazindol zur Behandlung der Aufmerksamkeitsdefizit-Hyperaktivitätsstörung | ||
Former [2013/10] | Combination of mazindol in the treatment of attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder | ||
Former [2013/10] | Association du mazindol dans le traitement du déficit de l'attention/hyperactivité | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 06.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.01.2020 | 23.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07727980.0 / EP2004183 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070727980) is 25.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2007 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 11.04.2007 | |
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | CY | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 10.06.2020 | |
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2144410 (STABIL BIOTERAPICO FARMACHIM) [A] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9111184 (UNIV YALE [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, lines 13-31; claims 9,10,16,23 *; | [A]WO9321917 (UNIV YALE [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 11; example 1; claims 1,2,11 *; | [A]WO02053104 (SENTION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 28, line 18 - page 29, line 33; figure 22; claims 4,13 *; | [XYI]WO2004091546 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1,6,13 * claims 2,21,33 * [Y] 5,9-12 [I] 2-4,7; | [Y]WO2004105744 (ASSIST PUBL HOPITAUX DE PARIS [FR], et al) [Y] 5,9-12 * claims 1-3,9-13,15-18,21 *; | [A] - VAZQUEZ-ALVAREZ A ET AL, "MAZINDOL EFFECTS ON LEAD - INDUCED LOCOMOTOR HYPERACTIVITY IN MICE.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2002), Database accession no. PREV200300327254, XP002395485 [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [ ] - SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, 32ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE; ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA; NOVEMBER 02-07, 2002, (2002), vol. 2002, pages Abstract No. 804.6 URL - http://sf | [A] - WALTHER B W, "TREATING RESTLESS LEGS SYNDROME: CURRENT PATHOPHYSIOLOGICAL CONCEPTS AND CLINICAL TRIALS", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB, (200204), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 501 - 514, XP009024933 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.11.4.501 | [A] - ZHOU J, "Norepinephrine transporter inhibitors and their therapeutic potential", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE 2004 SPAIN, (2004), vol. 29, no. 12, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 1235 - 1244, XP002395478 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2004.029.12.855246 | by applicant | - SLEEP, SLEEP, (20011215), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 213 - 8 | - GRUBER ET AL., "instability of sleep patterns in children with attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder", J AM ACAD CHILD ADOLESC PSYCHIATRY, (2000), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 495 - 501 | - RUIVARD ET AL., REV. MéD. INTERNE, (2000), vol. 21, pages 837 - 843 | - LOZOFF, ADV PEDIATR, (1989), vol. 6, pages 331 - 59 | - MARDER F ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (1998), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 1138 - 40 | - BIEDERMAN J; SWANSON JM; WIGAL SB; KRATOCHVIL CJ; BOEFLNER SW; EARL CQ; JIANG J; GREENHILL L., "Efficacy and safety of modafinil film-coated tablets in children and adolescents with attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder: results of a randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled, flexible-dose study", PEDIATRICS, (2005), vol. 116, page E777 | - BIEDERMAN J; HEILIGENSTEIN JH; FANES DE; GALIL N; DITTMANN R; EMSLIE GJ; KRATOCHVIL CJ; LAWS HF; SCHUH KJ, "Efficacy of atomoxetine versus placebo in school-age girls with attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder", PEDIATRICS, (2002), vol. 110, no. 6, page 75 | - BUSBY K; FIRESTONE P; PIVIK RT, "Sleep pattem in hyperkinetic and normal children", SLEEP, (1981), vol. 4, pages 366 - 83 | - CARSKADON MA; DEMENT WC, "The multiple sleep latency test: what does R measure?", SLEEP, (1982), vol. 5, pages 67 - 72 | - CARSKADON MA; DEMENT WC; MITLER MM; ROTH T; WESTBROOK PR; KEENAN S, "Guidelines for the Multiple Sleep Latency Test (MSLT): a standard measure of sleepiness", SLEEP, (1986), vol. 9, pages 519 - 24 | - CHERVIN RD; ARCHBOLD KH; DILLON JE; PITUCH KJ; PANAHI P; DAHI RE; GUILLEMINAULT C., "Associations between symptoms of inattention, hyperactivity, restless legs, and periodic leg movements", SLEEP, (20011215), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 213 - 8 | - CORKUM P; MOLDOFSKY H; HOGG-JOHNSON; HUMPHRIES T.; TANNOCK R, "Sleep problems in children with attention-deticit/hyperactivity disorder: impact of Subtype, comorbidity, and stimulant medication", J AM ACAD CHILD ADOLESC PSYCHIATRY, (1999), vol. 38, pages 1285 - 93 | - CORKUM P; TANNOCK R; MOLDOFSKY H, "Sleep disturbances in children with attention deficit hyperactivity disorder", J AM ACAD CHILD ADOLESC PSYCHIATRY, (1998), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 637 - 46 | - CORTESE S; KONOFAL E; LECENDREUX M; AMULF I; MOUREN MC; DARRA F; DALLA BEMARDINA B., "Restless legs syndrome and attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder: a review of the literature", SLEEP, (2005), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 1007 - 13 | - GOLAN N; SHAHAR E; RAVID S; PILLAR G, "Sleep disorders and daytime sleepiness in children with attention-deficit/hyperactive disorder", SLEEP, (2004), vol. 15, pages 261 - 6 | - GREENHILL LL; PUIG-ANTICH J; GOETZ R; HANLON C, "Sleep architecture and REM sleep measure in prepubertal children with attention deficit disorder with hyperactivity", SLEEP, (1983), vol. 6, pages 91 - 101 | - HADIER AJ, "Mazindol, a new non-amphetamine anorexigenic agent", J CLIN PHARMACOL NEW DRUGS, (1972), vol. 12, pages 453 - 8 | - KAPLAN BJ; MCNICOL J; CONTE RA; MOGHADAM HK, "Sleep disturbance in preschool aged hyperactive and nonhyperactive children", PEDIATRICS, (1987), vol. 80, pages 839 - 44 | - KONOFAL E; LECENDREUX M; BOUVARD M; MOUREN-SIMÉONI M-C, "High levels of nocturnal activity in children with ADHD : a video analysis", PSYCHIATRY CLIN NEUROSCI, (2001), vol. 55, no. 2, pages 97 - 103 | - KONOFAL E; LECENDREUX M; MOUREN-SIMEONI M-C, "Sleep in children with attention deficit/hyperactivity disorder: a restatement on sleep studies", ANN MED PSYCHOL, (2002), vol. 160, pages 105 - 17 | - KONOFAL E; LECENDREUX M; ARNULF I; MOUREN MC, "Iron deficiency in children with attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder", ARCH PEDIATR ADOLESC MED., (2004), no. 12, page 158 | - KONOLÀL E; CORTESE S; LECENDREUX M; AMULF I; MOUREN MC, "Effectiveness of Iron supplementation in a young child With Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder", PEDIATRICS, (2005), vol. 116, no. 5 | - LECENDREUX M; KONOFAL E; BOUVARD M; FALISSARD B; MOUREN-SIMEONI M-C, "Sleep and alertness in children with ADHD", J CHILD PSYCHOL PSYCHIATRY, (2000), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 803 - 12 | - MICK E; BIEDERMAN J; JETTON J; FARAONE SV, "Sleep disturbances associated with attention deficit hyperactivity disorder: the impact of psychiatrie comorbidity and pharmacotherapy", J CHILD ADOLESC PSYCHOPHARMACOL FALL, (2000), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 223 - 31 | - PALM L; PERSSON E; BJERRE L; ELMQVIST D, "Sleep and wakefulness in preadolescent children with deficits in attention, motor control and perception", ACTA PAEDIATR, (1992), vol. 81, pages 618 - 24 | - PICCHIETTI DL; WALTERS AS, "Restless legs syndrome and periodic Iimb movement disorder in children and adolescents: comorbidity with attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder", CHILD ADOLESC. PSYCHIATRY CLIN N AM, (1996), vol. 5, pages 729 - 40 | - PLATON MJR; VELA BUENO A; ESPINAR SIERRA J; KALES S, "Hypnopolygraphic alterations in attention deficit disorder (ADD) children", INTERN J NEUROSCI, (1990), vol. 53, pages 87 - 101 | - POPPER CW, "Pharmacologie alternatives to psychostimulants for the treatment of attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder", CHILD ADOLESC PSYCHIATR CLIN N AM, (2000), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 605 - 46 | - RUGINO TA; COPLEY TC, "Effects of modafinil in children with attention deficit/hyperactivity disorder: an open study", J AM ACAD CHILD ADOLESC PSYCHIATRY, (2001), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 230 - 5 | - SHINDLER J; SCHACHTER M; BRINCAT S; PARKES JD, "Amphetamine, mazindol, and fencamfamin in narcolepsy", BR MED J., (1985), vol. 20, pages 1167 - 70 | - TROMMER BL; HOEPPNER JB; ROSENBERG RS; ARMSTRONG KJ; ROTHSTEIN JA, "Sleep disturbance in children with attention deficit disorder", ANN NEUROLOGY, (1988), vol. 24, page 322 | - WALTERS AS; MANDELBAUM DE; LEWIN DS; KUGLER S; ENGLAND SJ; MILLER M, "Dopaminergic therapy in children with restless legs/periodic limb movements in sleep and ADHD", PEDIATR NEUROL, (2000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 182 - 6 | - WEINBERG WA; BRUMBACK RA, "Primary disorder of vigilance: a novel explanation of inattentiveness, daydreaming, boredom, restlessness, and sleepiness", J PEDIATR, (1992), vol. 116, pages 720 - 5 | - WEINBERG WA; HARPER CR, "Vigilance and its disorders", NEU ROI CLIN, (1993), vol. 11, pages 59 - 78 | - WEISS M; MURRAY C; WEISS G, "Adults with attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder: current concepts", J PSYCHIATR PRACT., (2002), vol. 28, pages 99 - 111 |