EP2597534 - Developing device and image forming apparatus including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jong-in 102-604 Seongji Apt. Gwonseon-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Dong-uk 405 972-10 Ingye-dong Paldalgu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Joo, Jong-hwa 57-212 Siyeong Apt. Garak-dong Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Choi, Woong-yong 104-902 Hyundai Apt. Seocheon-dong Gilheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2013/22] | Misselbrook, Paul Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12189888.6 | 25.10.2012 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | KR20110122407 | 22.11.2011 Original published format: KR 20110122407 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2597534 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2597534 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2597534 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/18 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
G03G21/1821 (EP,US);
G03G15/06 (KR);
G03G15/0896 (US);
G03G21/1825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2013/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Entwicklungsvorrichtung und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung damit | [2013/22] | English: | Developing device and image forming apparatus including the same | [2013/22] | French: | Unité de développement et appareil de formation d'images doté de celle-ci | [2015/43] |
Former [2013/22] | Unité de développement et appareil de formation dýimages doté de celle-ci | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 21.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2012 | AL | 21.10.2015 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | IE | 25.10.2015 | LU | 25.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.10.2012 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 25.10.2012 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.10.2012 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 21.10.2015 | |
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 21.10.2015 | |
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 21.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009003875 (TOBA SHINJIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0059] * | Examination | US2006159487 |