EP2602007 - Athletic performance sensing and/or tracking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Nike International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riley, Raymond, W. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005 / US | 02 /
Hoffer, Kevin, W. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005 / US | 03 /
Berner, William, E., Jr. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005 / US | 04 /
Schrock, Allan, M. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005 / US | 05 /
Niegowski, James, A. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005 / US | 06 /
Rauchholz, William, F. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005 / US | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2014/32] | McCartney, Jonathan William, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2013/24] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12190344.7 | 06.09.2007 | [2013/24] | Priority number, date | US20060824822P | 07.09.2006 Original published format: US 824822 P | US20070848988 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: US 848988 | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2602007 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2602007 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63B24/00, A63B71/06, A63B22/00 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (US);
A61B5/74 (US);
A61B5/7405 (US);
A63B24/0006 (US);
A63B24/0062 (US);
A63B24/0075 (US);
A63B24/0087 (US);
A63B71/06 (US);
A63B71/0616 (US);
A63B71/0622 (US);
A63B71/0686 (US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G06F16/4387 (EP,US);
G06F3/165 (US);
G06Q10/0639 (EP,US);
G09B5/02 (US);
G09B5/04 (US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
A61B2503/10 (US);
A63B2024/0065 (US);
A63B2024/0068 (US);
A63B2024/0071 (US);
A63B2071/0625 (US);
A63B2071/0694 (US);
A63B2220/00 (US);
A63B2220/12 (US);
A63B2220/17 (US);
A63B2220/20 (US);
A63B2220/30 (US);
A63B2220/836 (US);
A63B2225/20 (US);
A63B2230/06 (US);
A63B24/0059 (US);
A63B69/0028 (US);
A63B69/16 (US);
G06F16/68 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2013/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zum Messen und/oder Verfolgen von sportlichen Leistungen | [2013/24] | English: | Athletic performance sensing and/or tracking system | [2013/24] | French: | Détection de performance athlétique et système de suivi | [2013/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07837757.9 / EP2059310 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070837757) is 19.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2007 | AT | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | ES | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | IT | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | NL | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | PT | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IE | 06.09.2018 | LU | 06.09.2018 | MT | 06.09.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 06.09.2007 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | Cited in | Examination | US2003224337 | WO2004072767 | US2005209050 | US2005250458 | by applicant | US20050166351 | US20060407328 | US20060416458 |