EP2724955 - Folding box, container and manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R I S S M A N N Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Lenkersheimer Strasse 26 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/19] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states Rissmann, Patrick Jakobinenstrasse 14 90762 Fürth / DE | ||
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Rissmann GmbH Lenkersheimer Strasse 26 90431 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rissmann, Patrick Jakobinenstrasse 14 90762 Fürth / DE | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Götz, Georg Alois Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Literaturhaus, Königstrasse 70 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12190375.1 | 29.10.2012 | [2014/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724955 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/68, B65D5/24, B65D5/42, B65D5/20 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B65D5/4279 (EP);
B65D5/20 (EP);
B65D5/4283 (EP);
B65D5/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Faltschachtel, Behälter und Herstellungsverfahren | [2014/18] | English: | Folding box, container and manufacturing method | [2014/18] | French: | Boîte pliante, récipient et procédé de fabrication | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 24.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2016 | 15.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31] | 28.03.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1968062U (LUCAS & SOEHNE RICHARD [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-10,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US1994803 (ATKINS HARRY C) [X] 1,2,4-15 * column 2, lines 3-30; figures 1-8 *; | [X]DE19840490 (GEFINEX POLYMERSCHAEUME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12,14,15 * column 3, lines 16-53; figures 3-8 *; | [X]US3623651 (MARCAN BETTY MURIEL, et al) [X] 1-12,14,15 * column 2, lines 63-75; figures 7, 8 *; | [X]FR2946625 (FIMAGE PACKAGING II [FR]) [X] 1,4,8,9,15 * figures 1, 2, 4, 5 *; | [A]FR2706417 (SCA EMBALLAGE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 13 * figures 1, 3, 4 * |