EP2727739 - Card body with changeable film layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trüb AG Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12 5000 Aarau / CH | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sailer, Christian Walterswilerstrasse 5a 5745 Safenwil / CH | 02 /
Bächli, Christoph Seidenstrasse 10 5200 Brugg / CH | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12190955.0 | 01.11.2012 | [2014/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2727739 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/14, B41M5/00, B42D25/00, B41M5/24, B41M5/30, B41M5/26, B41M5/34, B41M5/382 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
B41M3/14 (EP,US);
B29C59/16 (US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B27/365 (US);
B32B3/08 (US);
B42D25/21 (US);
B42D25/435 (US);
B29L2009/00 (US);
B32B2307/412 (US);
B32B2425/00 (US);
B41M5/24 (EP,US);
B41M5/267 (EP,US);
B41M5/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kartenkörper mit veränderbaren Folienlagen | [2014/19] | English: | Card body with changeable film layers | [2014/19] | French: | Corps de carte avec couches de film modifiables | [2014/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4417343 (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,13,14,16* the whole document *; | [Y]WO0236357 (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE], et al) [Y] 7,8,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US6867167 (CHRISTEN PAUL [CH], et al) [X] 1,13,14,16 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 32 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 42 *; | [XYI]US2011033676 (LESUR JEAN-LUC [FR]) [X] 1-5,11,14,16 * paragraphs [0004] , [0021] - [0023]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 7,8,12 [I] 6,9,15; | [XYI]WO2011124920 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,14,16 * page 5, line 20 - page 5, line 28 * * page 4, line 10 - page 4, line 17 * * page 13, line 13 - page 13, line 17 * * page 14, line 27 - page 14, line 33 * * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 9 * [Y] 7,8,12 [I] 6,9,15; | [X]DE102010024790 (MUEHLBAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1,13,14,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0028] , [0030] , [0031] * |