EP2589730 - Lock and bolt for a lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maathuis, Benno Olieslagweg 120 7521 JG Enschede / NL | For all designated states Boerties, Henri Sluiskade Noordzijde 49 7676 SH Westerhaar / NL | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Mink-Lindenburg, Charlotte Hildegard Octrooibureau Mink B.V. P.O. Box 85658 2508 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Mink-Lindenburg, Charlotte Hildegard Octrooibureau Mink B.V. P.O. Box 53 7600 AB Almelo / NL | Application number, filing date | 12191046.7 | 02.11.2012 | [2013/19] | Priority number, date | NL20111039151 | 02.11.2011 Original published format: NL 1039151 | [2013/19] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2589730 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05B15/10, E05B17/20, E05C1/08 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
E05B15/10 (EP);
E05B17/2003 (EP);
E05C1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schloss und Falle für ein Schloss | [2013/19] | English: | Lock and bolt for a lock | [2013/19] | French: | Serrure et pêne pour serrure | [2013/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1471061 (REINEMAN EDWIN A) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB360812 (JOHN BIRCH AND SONS LTD, et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]GB513927 (ARCHIBALD BAIRD MURRAY JUNIOR) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3948550 (VIGLUICCI KENNETH, et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008036220 (TASHI PEMPA [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011252842 (MORN NICHOLAS ORAL [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0023] - [0030]; figures 1-5 * |