EP2656732 - Apparatus for controlling algal blooms and killing pathogens in fish tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enbion 603, Intellium-centum, U-dong Haeundae-gu Busan / KR | For all designated states Republic of Korea (National Fisheries Research And Development Institute) 408-1 Sirang-ri Gijang-up Gijang-gun, Busan 619-902 / KR | [2016/41] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Enbion 603, Intellium-centum, U-dong Haeundae-gu Busan / KR | ||
For all designated states Republic of Korea (National Fisheries Research And Development Institute) 408-1 Sirang-ri Gijang-eup Gijang-gun, Busan 619-902 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kyoung Hoon 104-403, Samsung Apt. Jwa-4 dong Haeundae-gu Busan / KR | 02 /
Park, Seong Wook 17-10, Myeongnyun-dong, Dongnae-gu Busan / KR | 03 /
Kim, Seong Hun 101-108, Daeyeon Beach Apt. Daeyeon 3-dong Nam-gu Busan / KR | 04 /
Jang, Kyu Sup 3403, Centum Leaders mark, U-dong Haeundae-gu Busan / KR | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | van Essen, Peter Augustinus, et al Van Essen Patent B.V. Lange Amerikaweg 81 7332 BP Apeldoorn / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | van Essen, Peter Augustinus, et al Van Essen Patent B.V. Agro Business Park 50 6708 PW Wageningen / NL | ||
Former [2013/44] | van Essen, Peter Augustinus Ellens & van Essen Agro Business Park 20 6708 PW Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 12191234.9 | 05.11.2012 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | KR20120043045 | 25.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120043045 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2656732 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2656732 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01K63/04 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
A01K63/04 (EP,KR,US);
A01K63/006 (US);
A01K63/042 (EP,US);
A01K63/045 (EP,US);
C02F1/46 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bekämpfung von Algenblüten und zum Abtöten von Krankheitserregern in einem Aquarium | [2013/44] | English: | Apparatus for controlling algal blooms and killing pathogens in fish tank | [2013/44] | French: | Appareil pour réguler la prolifération et la destruction d'organismes pathogènes dans un réservoir de poissons | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 28.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2012 | AL | 12.10.2016 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | IE | 05.11.2016 | MT | 05.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
MT | 05.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
MT | 05.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1119648 (KYOEI AQUA TEC KK) [X] 1,4,9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0 12] * * abstract * * figures 1-3, 5 * [I] 2,3,5-8,10-13; | [XI]US2004118701 (SENKIW JAMES ANDREW [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] - [0 38] - [0042] - [0 45] - [0048] - [0 64] * * figures 1A-5B * [I] 3-13; | [XI]JP2008237168 (INST NAT COLLEGES TECH JAPAN) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [0011] - [0016] * * abstract * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2,9-11; | [A]US2003226766 (ORLEBEKE DAVID N [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0013] - [0026] - [0 56] - [0058] - [0 78] - [0098] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5543034 (HILBERTZ WOLF H [IE], et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 25 - column 12, line 7 * * column 12, line 33 - column 13, line 31 * * figures 1-5, 8 * |