EP2583920 - Device for transporting objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seger, Martin Eugen-Roth-Straße 58 92318 Neumarkt i. d. Opf. / DE | 02 /
Hüttner, Johann Upskofen 401 84066 Mallersdorf-Pfaffenberg / DE | 03 /
Halbo, Hansjörg Rathausstraße 5 93142 Maxhütte-Haidhof / DE | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12191417.0 | 18.12.2008 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | DE20081004775 | 16.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008004775 | [2013/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583920 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2583920 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/51, // B65G21/18 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
B65G21/18 (EP,US);
B65G47/5131 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transportieren von Gegenständen | [2013/17] | English: | Device for transporting objects | [2013/17] | French: | Dispositif de transport d'objets | [2013/50] |
Former [2013/17] | Dispositif de transport dýobjets | Examination procedure | 08.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 04.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08870805.2 / EP2229328 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080870805) is 11.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2008 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | ES | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | NO | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | AT | 18.12.2014 | GB | 18.12.2014 | IE | 18.12.2014 | LU | 18.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.12.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
AT | 18.12.2014 | ||
GB | 18.12.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
AT | 18.12.2014 | ||
GB | 18.12.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
AT | 18.12.2014 | ||
GB | 18.12.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
GB | 18.12.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202004012848U (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1 * columns 1-5; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6152291 (STEEBER DORIAN F [US], et al) [A] 1 * columns 1,6-8; figures 1-22 *; | [A]US5413213 (GOLZ PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * columns 8,20-23; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP1295820 (SIG SIMONAZZI SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 4; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2300613 (FERAG AG [CH]) [A] 1 * pages 2,4-10; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1849725 (SPECIALTY CONVEYOR BV [NL]) [A] 1 * columns 3-7; figures 1-9 * | by applicant | DE202004012848U | WO2005102880 | EP0581143 | WO2005073113 |