EP2557336 - Hydraulic control of a double clutch transmission and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states hofer mechatronik GmbH Ohmstraße 15 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2013/38] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states hofer mechatronik GmbH Nürtinger Strasse 78 72644 Oberboihingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naumann, Ralf Mittlerer Weg 50 73275 Ohmden / DE | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Cremer, Christian Cremer & Cremer Patentanwälte St.-Barbara-Straße 16 89077 Ulm / DE | [2013/07] | Application number, filing date | 12191666.2 | 20.07.2011 | [2013/07] | Priority number, date | DE20101036545 | 21.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010036545 | DE20101037243 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010037243 | [2013/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2557336 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2557336 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2557336 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/688, // F16D48/02, F16H61/02 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
F16H61/688 (EP);
F16D48/0206 (EP);
F16H61/0206 (EP);
F16D2048/0233 (EP);
F16D2048/0278 (EP);
F16D2048/029 (EP);
F16D2048/0293 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] |
Former [2013/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Getriebehydraulik eines Doppelkupplungsgetriebes und Steuerungsverfahren mit hydraulischen Ventilen für ein Doppelkupplungsgetriebe | [2013/07] | English: | Hydraulic control of a double clutch transmission and control method thereof | [2013/07] | French: | Commande hydraulique pour boîte de vitesses à double embrayage et son procédé de contrôle | [2013/07] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 30.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11174667.3 / EP2410212 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110174667) is 12.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2011 | AL | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | AT | 20.07.2019 | IE | 20.07.2019 | LU | 20.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE10134115 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0041] , [0044] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 6,7; | [XD]EP1449708 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [XD] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0037] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1450076 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0037] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102005006431 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] * * figure 4 *; | [Y]WO2009111220 (BORGWARNER INC [US], et al) [Y] 7 * page 15, lines 27-29 * * examples 2,3 *; | [Y]WO03040580 (PORSCHE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * page 7, lines 17-18 * * figure 2 * | Examination | DE102007023072 | DE102006016397 | by applicant | FR2848629 | EP2055989 | DE102007010292 | US2009045026 | EP2025972 | EP1450076 | EP1449708 | WO2009111220 | WO03040580 | DE102008046350 | DE102005006431 | DE102007023072 | DE10134115 | DE102006016397 | WO2008108977 | CN101583510 | US5367914 | EP1717473 | CN101163901 | EP1449708 | WO2004097265 | DE102010036545 |