EP2597613 - Relative pose estimation of non-overlapping cameras using the motion of subjects in the camera fields of view [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA 91521 / US | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foote, Eric 4720 Forbes Ave. Ste. 110 Pittsburgh, PA 15213 / US | 02 /
Carr, G. Peter K. 4720 Forbes Ave. Ste. 110 Pittsburgh, PA 15213 / US | 03 /
Sheikh, Yaser 5000 Forbes Ave. Pittsburgh, PA 15213 / US | 04 /
Matthews, Iain 4720 Forbes Ave. Ste. 110 Pittsburgh, PA 15213 / US | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2015/18] |
Former [2013/22] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12191685.2 | 07.11.2012 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | US201113292299 | 09.11.2011 Original published format: US201113292299 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2597613 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2597613 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
G06T7/73 (EP,US);
G06T7/77 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2013/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Relative Poseneinschätzung von nicht überlappenden Kameras unter Verwendung von Gegenstandsbewegung in den Sichtfeldern der Kamera | [2013/22] | English: | Relative pose estimation of non-overlapping cameras using the motion of subjects in the camera fields of view | [2013/22] | French: | Estimation de pose relative des caméras sans chevauchement utilisant le mouvement des sujets dans les champs de vision de la caméra | [2013/22] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 03.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2012 | AL | 29.04.2015 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | ES | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | IT | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | MT | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | RS | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | SM | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | IE | 07.11.2015 | LU | 07.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.11.2012 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.11.2012 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0247031 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, lines 22-27 * * page 4, lines 1-11,26-27 * * page 17, lines 8-17 * * page 18, line 28 - page 19, line 12 * * page 37, line 27 - page 41, line 2 *; | [A] - Anubhav Agarwal ET AL, "A Survey of Planar Homography Estimation Techniques", Tech. Rep. IIIT/TR/2005/12, Hyderabad, (20050101), URL: http://cvit.iiit.ac.in/papers/anubhav05ASurvey.pdf, (20121218), XP055048136 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 2.5] , [03.1] , [3.1.2] , [3.1.4] , [3.1.5] * | [A] - NADEEM ANJUM ET AL, "Camera network localization using trajectory estimation", EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES (ICET), 2011 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110905), doi:10.1109/ICET.2011.6048454, ISBN 978-1-4577-0769-8, pages 1 - 6, XP032062172 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICET.2011.6048454 | [A] - RAHIMI A ET AL, "Simultaneous calibration and tracking with a network of non-overlapping sensors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION 27 JUNE-2 JULY 2004 WASHINGTON, DC, USA, IEEE, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION IEE, (20040627), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/CVPR.2004.1315031, ISBN 978-0-7695-2158-9, pages 187 - 194, XP010708999 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - [0006] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2004.1315031 | [A] - RADU HORAUD ET AL, "Stereo calibration from rigid motions", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (20001201), vol. 22, no. 12, doi:10.1109/34.895977, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 1446 - 1452, XP055048197 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [000I] , [00IV] , [00VI] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.895977 |