EP2592128 - Metallic particle induced saponification of fatty acids as breakers for viscoelastic surfactant-gelled fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated 2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crews, James B. 5206 Sunshine Point Willis, TX 77318 / US | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12191818.9 | 08.11.2012 | [2013/20] | Priority number, date | US201113294301 | 11.11.2011 Original published format: US201113294301 | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592128 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/03, C09K8/52, C09K8/68 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
C09K8/03 (EP,US);
C09K8/52 (EP,US);
C09K8/68 (EP,US);
C09K2208/10 (EP,US);
C09K2208/26 (EP,US);
C09K2208/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Metallpartikelinduzierte Verseifung von Fettsäuren als Brecher von viskoelastischen tensidgelierten Fluiden | [2013/20] | English: | Metallic particle induced saponification of fatty acids as breakers for viscoelastic surfactant-gelled fluids | [2013/20] | French: | Saponification induite par des particules métalliques d'acides gras comme rupteurs pour fluides gélifiés par tensioactifs viscoélastiques | [2013/20] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 30.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006102042 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [I] 1-21 * examples 4-8; claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [I]WO2008106695 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * paragraph [0048]; claims 1-5 ** the whole document *; | [I]WO2009032524 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * paragraph [0041]; claims 1,2 * * the whole document *; | [I]WO2010047705 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * examples 4-8; claim 1 * * the whole document * | by applicant | US6425277 | US6506710 | US6703352 | US7728044 | US2011135953 | US8044106 |