EP2572680 - Apparatuses for bone restoration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vexim 8, rue Vidailhan Bâtiment Hills Plaza 31130 Balma / FR | [2016/13] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Vexim 10, rue Hermès 31240 L' Union / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leonard, Alain La Pagnole 1 route de Montastruc 31380 Paulhac / FR | 02 /
Oglaza, Jean-François 7 rue Georges de Buffon 31130 Balma / FR | 03 /
Renaud, Christian Chemin Lucien Calmels 81160 Arthes / FR | 04 /
Huet, Gildas 9 rue de la Platière 69001 Lyon / FR | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/19] | 01 /
Leonard, Alain La Pagnole 1 route de Montastruc 31380 Paulhac / FR | ||
02 /
Oglaza, Jean-François 7 rue Georges de Buffon 31130 Balma / FR | |||
03 /
Renaud, Christian Chemin Lucien Calmels 81160 Arthes / FR | |||
04 /
Huet, Gildas 1 square des Aigles 60500 Chantilly / FR | |||
Former [2013/13] | 01 /
Leonard, Alain 6, rue des Pyrenees 65500 Caixon / FR | ||
02 /
Oglaza, Jean-François 7 rue Georges de Buffon 31130 Balma / FR | |||
03 /
Renaud, Christian Chemin Lucien Calmels 81160 Arthes / FR | |||
04 /
Huet, Gildas 1 square des Aigles 60500 Chantilly / FR | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2016/17] |
Former [2013/15] | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 12191848.6 | 08.06.2005 | [2013/13] | Priority number, date | FR20040006211 | 09.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0406211 | US20040951766 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: US 951766 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2572680 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2572680 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/8858 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/4425 (US);
A61F2/00 (KR);
A61F2/02 (KR);
A61F2/28 (KR);
A61F2/44 (EP,US);
A61F2/442 (US);
A61F2/4601 (US);
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30224 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30471 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30556 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30579 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (US);
A61F2002/30601 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30617 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30772 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30774 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4629 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4635 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2013/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen Zur Knochenwiederherstellung | [2015/47] | English: | Apparatuses for bone restoration | [2013/13] | French: | Dispositif pour la restauration osseuse | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/13] | Vorrichtungen zur Knochenwiederherstellung | Examination procedure | 16.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 06.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05780621.8 / EP1778136 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050780621) is 29.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2005 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | LU | 08.06.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 08.06.2005 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.06.2005 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.06.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.06.2005 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9834568 (LI MEDICAL TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10-13 * page 19 - page 22 * [I] 6; | [XI]US5800550 (SERTICH MARIO M [US]) [X] 1,3-5,12,13 * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 47 *[I] 6; | [X]FR2782632 (MATERIEL ORTHOPEDIQUE EN ABREG [FR]) [X] 1,3-6,10-19 * page 12, line 3 - page 14, line 9 *; | [XI]US6190414 (YOUNG WAYNE P [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,12,13 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 46 * [I] 6 |