EP2592570 - Pronounceable domain names [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VeriSign, Inc. 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mugali, Aditya 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | 02 /
Simpson, Andrew 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | 03 /
Walker, Scott 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Benson, Christopher, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2013/20] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12191872.6 | 08.11.2012 | [2013/20] | Priority number, date | US201161557248P | 08.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161557248 P | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2592570 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2592570 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27, G06F17/28, H04L29/12 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
G06F40/56 (EP,US);
G06F40/253 (US);
G06F40/40 (US);
H04L61/3025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/20] | G06F17/27, G10L15/187 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2013/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aussprechbare Domänennamen | [2013/20] | English: | Pronounceable domain names | [2013/20] | French: | Noms de domaine prononçables | [2013/20] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 27.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2007083369 (MCCULLER PATRICK [US]) [I] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0045] * * figures 8A, 8B * [Y] 10; | [Y]WO0229593 (ENIC CORP [US], et al) [Y] 10 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 9, line 9 *; | [A]US2005004915 (HERMAND JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] * | [Y] - Ethan, "Name.com Introduces Domain Nabber NXD Scores for .Net, .CC and .TV", Name.com Blog, (20110815), URL: http://www.name.com/blog/general/development/2011/08/name-com-introduces-domain-nabber-nxd-scores-for-net-cc-and-tv/, (20150304), XP055173601 [Y] 10 * the whole document * |