EP2594835 - Hybrid V-band coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voss Industries, Inc. 2168 West 25th Street Cleveland, OH 44113 / US | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritskey, John F. 15035 Stillbrooke Dr. Strongsville Cleveland, OH Ohio 44136 / US | 02 /
Orzech, James Michael 1282 Waldo Way Twinsburg, OH Ohio 44087 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Bailey, David Martin Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Bailey, David Martin Brookes Batchellor LLP 46 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12193016.8 | 16.11.2012 | [2013/21] | Priority number, date | US201161560623P | 16.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161560623 P | US201213677589 | 15.11.2012 Original published format: US201213677589 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2594835 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/10 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
F16L23/10 (EP,US);
F16L23/04 (US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hybrid V-profilierter Klemmeverbinder | [2013/21] | English: | Hybrid V-band coupling | [2013/21] | French: | Collier de raccord à profil en V | [2013/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3600770 (HALLING HORACE P) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line l * * figure - *; | [AD]US5454606 (VOSS WILLIAM J [US], et al) [AD] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XI]US2005108859 (AMENDOLEA RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * figure - * [I] 3-6,11-13; | [A]WO2006094761 (METU MEINIG AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,4-7,13 * page 9, lines 8-17 * * figure - * | by applicant | US5454606 |