EP2595362 - Aircraft computer system for executing inflight entertainment and electronic flight bag applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flight Focus Pte. Ltd. 17 Changi Business Park Central 1 06-09 Honeywell Building Singapore 486073 / SG | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cabos, Ralf c/o Flight Focus Pte. Ltd. 17 Changi Business Park Central 1, Unit 06-09 Honeywell Building 486073 Singapore / SG | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Schweiger, Martin, et al Patentanwalt Martin Schweiger Erhardtstraße 12 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Schweiger, Martin, et al Schweiger & Partner Karlstraße 35 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12193123.2 | 19.11.2012 | [2013/21] | Priority number, date | WO2011IB55147 | 17.11.2011 Original published format: PCT/IB2011/055147 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2595362 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/40, H04L12/70, H04L12/931, G06F9/50, B64D11/00 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
B64D11/0015 (EP);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
G06F9/445 (EP,US);
H04L12/40039 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04N21/2146 (EP,US);
H04N21/241 (EP,US);
H04N21/63 (EP,US);
G06F9/4406 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flugzeugcomputersystem zur Ausführung von Flugunterhaltungs-, und Electronic Flight Bag-Anwendungen | [2013/21] | English: | Aircraft computer system for executing inflight entertainment and electronic flight bag applications | [2013/21] | French: | Système informatique d'aéronef pour exécuter des applications de divertissement en vol et sac d'avion électronique | [2013/21] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0248844 (APOMON APS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 13, lines 7-25 * * page 18, line 24 - page 20, line 3 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US2007115938 (CONZACHI KEITH D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0046] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2007127460 (WILBER GEORGE F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0048] * * paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2008208399 (PHAM TUAN A [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0053] * * paragraph [0059] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2010152924 (PANDIT ANIL KUMAR [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] * * figures 2,3,7 *; | [A]US2010150151 (ARMANINI JUNIOR PAULO ROBERTO [BR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] *; | [IPA]US8264376 (MCLOUGHLIN FRANK A [US], et al) [IP] 7-12 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 45 * * column 7, lines 13-24 * * column 7, lines 43-53 * * column 8, lines 8-36 * * column 8, line 60 - column 10, line 16 * * figures 1b,1c,2,6 *[A] 1-6,13-15 |