EP2658093 - Sintered bearing-equipped bldc motor for hair dryer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JMW Co. Ltd. 913, 914 Daerung Post Tower 6 50-3 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lim, Tae Hyun 12-1003, Sindong-a Apt. Banghak 3-dong, Dobong-gu 132-762 Seoul / KR | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12193170.3 | 19.11.2012 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | KR20120041970 | 23.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120041970 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2658093 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/167 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H02K7/085 (EP,US);
A45D20/12 (EP,US);
F16C33/128 (EP,US);
H02K5/1675 (EP,US);
H02K7/04 (EP,US);
H02K9/227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mit Sintergleitlager ausgerüsteter BLDC-Motor für einen Haartrockner | [2013/44] | English: | Sintered bearing-equipped bldc motor for hair dryer | [2013/44] | French: | Moteur à courant continu sans balais pour sèche-cheveux comportant un palier fritté | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 10.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | KR100935158B |