EP2594276 - Highly stable electrolytic water with reduced nmr halfline width [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APR Nanotechnologies S.A. Via Corti 5 6828 Balerna / CH | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Yongge Room 1206, Haoxianyuan No. 17 Renshengli Cangbian Road 510039 Guangzhou / CN | 02 /
De Noni, Roberto Via Ronzon, 3 31010 Fregona / IT | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12193285.9 | 25.04.2008 | [2013/21] | Priority number, date | US20070926182P | 25.04.2007 Original published format: US 926182 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2594276 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2594276 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00, C02F1/461, A61P17/00 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
C01G23/00 (KR);
A61K33/20 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C01G23/047 (KR);
C01G23/053 (KR);
C02F1/4618 (EP,US);
C02F1/4674 (EP,US);
C25B1/26 (EP,US);
C25B11/073 (EP,US);
C25B13/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/005 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46142 (EP,US);
C02F2103/026 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02W10/37 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | Hochstabiles Elektrolysewasser mit verringerter halber NMR-Linienbreite | [2013/21] | English: | Highly stable electrolytic water with reduced nmr halfline width | [2013/21] | French: | Eau électrolytique extrêmement stable à largeur de raie à mi-hauteur de RMN réduite | [2014/23] |
Former [2013/21] | Eau electrolytique extremement stable a largeur de raie a mi-hauteur de RMN Reduite | Examination procedure | 08.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08749157.7 / EP2162140 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080749157) is 08.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.07.2013 | 30.04.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2008 | AT | 01.10.2014 | BE | 01.10.2014 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | CZ | 01.10.2014 | DK | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | NL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | SE | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | NO | 01.01.2015 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | IE | 25.04.2015 | LU | 25.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/48] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.04.2008 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 01.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9719707 (IST INSTANT SURFACE TECHNOLOGY [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 8, column second - page 11, column second; figures 1,2; claims 1-17 *; | [AD]US5824353 (TSUNODA KENJI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-10* column 1, line 17 - column 1, line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]US6235186 (TANAKA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 27 - column 6, line 28; figure 1; example 3; claims 21,22 *; | [A]US2002134691 (SATOH FUMITAKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0035] , [0039] , [0042]; claims 1,19-24; tables 1,3,4 *; | [A]WO2004078654 (FUKUI KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 8 *; | [A]US2005189237 (SANO YOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 6-9; tables 1-6 *; | [AP]WO2007048772 (AKUATECH S R L [IT], et al) [AP] 1-10 * page 16, line 15 - page 17, line 14; claims 14-20,22-28 *; | [A] - VENKITANRAYANAN KS ET AL, "Efficacy of Electrolyzed Oxidising Water for Inctivating Escherichia coli O157:H7, Salmonella enteritidis and Listeria monocytogenes", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200609), vol. 65, no. 9, pages 4276 - 4279, XP002491601 [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - "Antimicrobial activity of electrolyzed oxidizing water using standard in-vitro test procedures for the evaluation of chemical disinfectants", (20051006), URL: http://www.water4u.net/file_download.php?filename=63ff8dbc4bb2121cc20add56549dcbe2, (20080807), XP002491600 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - HIDEMITSU HAYASHI, "Benefits of Alkaline, Ionized Water", (20051006), URL: http://www.ionizers.org/water.html, (20080808), XP002491602 [A] 1-10 * pages 8-10: "Oxidized Water" * | by applicant | US5824353 | - SHOKUHIN TO KAIHATSU, (1991), vol. 24, no. 7, page 83 |