EP2629255 - Calendar overlays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Larry, L. 11542 Tralee Drive Great Falls, VA 22066 / US | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12193429.3 | 17.01.2003 | [2013/34] | Priority number, date | US20020349251P | 18.01.2002 Original published format: US 349251 P | US20020283138 | 30.10.2002 Original published format: US 283138 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2629255 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06311 (EP,US);
G06F40/103 (US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1095 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/34] | Title | German: | Kalenderüberlagerungen | [2013/34] | English: | Calendar overlays | [2013/34] | French: | Superposition de calendriers | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03707418.4 / EP1466287 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IL] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * [L] 1-15 | by applicant | - FINANCIAL AID MEETING | - TUITION DUE TODAY | - TUITION DUE IN 3 DAYS | - FINANCIAL AID BUILDING-ROOM 340 |